Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of Edcouch, Et. Al., filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Jaime Javier Pena, against Guerra, Bobby, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 1995 |
CategoryTax Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 1999 | Docket Event |
Disposition ($DISP) ($DISP) |
|
June 23, 1999 | Docket Event |
Defendants Privilege Log Global Disposition: Defendants Privilege Log Global Disposition: Defendants Privilege Log |
|
June 23, 1999 | Docket Event | Status Conference Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hinojosa, Leticia) | |
June 23, 1999 | Docket Event |
Order T-003-95-C 06/23/99 ORDER SIGNED FOR NON-SUIT ORDER SIGNED (ORD) T-003-95-C 06/23/99 ORDER SIGNED FOR NON-SUIT ORDER SIGNED (ORD) |
|
June 22, 1999 | Docket Event |
Motion T-003-95-C 06/22/99 MOTION FOR NON-SUIT, FILED MOTION (MOT) T-003-95-C 06/22/99 MOTION FOR NON-SUIT, FILED MOTION (MOT) |
|
April 14, 1999 | Docket Event |
Citation by Certified Mail, Returned T-003-95-C 04/14/99 CITATION BY C/M RETU BOBBY GUERRA UNCLAIMED, RECEIVED CITATION BY C/M RETURNED (CM.R) T-003-95-C 04/14/99 CITATION BY C/M RETU BOBBY GUERRA UNCLAIMED, RECEIVED CITATION BY C/M RETURNED (CM.R) |
|
March 23, 1999 | Docket Event |
Citation by Certified Mail, Issued (Fee) T-003-95-C 03/23/99 CITATION BY C/M ISSU TO BOBBY GUERRA CITATION BY C/M ISSUED (CM.I) T-003-95-C 03/23/99 CITATION BY C/M ISSU TO BOBBY GUERRA CITATION BY C/M ISSUED (CM.I) |
|
March 18, 1999 | Docket Event | Dismissal Want of Prosecution (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Hinojosa, Leticia) | |
March 17, 1999 | Docket Event |
Second Amended T-003-95-C 03/17/99 SECOND AMENDED SECOND AMENDED PETITION, FILED ON 03/17/99 SECOND AMENDED (2ND) T-003-95-C 03/17/99 SECOND AMENDED SECOND AMENDED PETITION, FILED ON 03/17/99 SECOND AMENDED (2ND) |
|
December 20, 1995 | Docket Event |
Unknown 3950003 12/20/95 Doc Comment from Conv Not Applicable; *REC RET BOBBY GUERRA UNCLAIMED, RECEIVED DOC COMM FROM CONV (DOCC) 3950003 12/20/95 Doc Comment from Conv Not Applicable; *REC RET BOBBY GUERRA UNCLAIMED, RECEIVED DOC COMM FROM CONV (DOCC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.