Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Montes, Lorena Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Villafuerte, Omar Alberto, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Flores, Bobby presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children (Oca) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
DWOP Order, Signed
Date: October 16, 2017Motion
Date: May 19, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Costs Paid BY PLAINITFF BY PLAINITFF Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice MONTES, LORENA MARIE Returned Unserved 11/14/2017 Returned 11/14/2017 VILLAFUERTE, OMAR ALBERTO Returned Unserved 11/15/2017 Returned 11/15/2017
Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
DWOP Order, Signed
Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Flores, Bobby) Result: Held
Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed DWOP NOTICE DWOP NOTICE Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
DWOP Notice Sent
Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue DWOP NOTICE DWOP NOTICE Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Divorce Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Flores, Bobby) Result: Held
Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SEWING FINAL HEARING ORDER SEWING FINAL HEARING Judge: Flores, Bobby |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.