Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Guevara, Ramon, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Guevara, Irma Orosco, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Delgado, Rodolfo "Rudy" presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children (Oca) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDecree Of Divorce |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Court Costs Paid PARTY INCURRED PARTY INCURRED Judge: Delgado, Rodolfo "Rudy" |
|
August 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Returned Undeliverable
Judge: Delgado, Rodolfo "Rudy" |
|
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed Order Granting Waiver of 30 Day Waiting Period to Remarry Signed 7/9/15 Order Granting Waiver of 30 Day Waiting Period to Remarry Signed 7/9/15 Judge: Delgado, Rodolfo "Rudy" |
|
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent to both parties by c/m, w/cert copies of divorce decree to both parties by c/m, w/cert copies of divorce decree Judge: Delgado, Rodolfo "Rudy" |
|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Filed final decree of divorce final decree of divorce Judge: Delgado, Rodolfo "Rudy" |
|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Decree of Divorce, Signed
Judge: Delgado, Rodolfo "Rudy" |
|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue divorce divorce Judge: Delgado, Rodolfo "Rudy" |
|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Divorce Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Delgado, Rodolfo "Rudy") Result: Held
Judge: Delgado, Rodolfo "Rudy" |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Delgado, Rodolfo "Rudy") Result: No Appearance
Judge: Delgado, Rodolfo "Rudy" |
|
June 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent NOTICE OF HEARING, E-SERVED TO RAMON GUEVERA NOTICE OF HEARING, E-SERVED TO RAMON GUEVERA Judge: Delgado, Rodolfo "Rudy" |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.