Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gabriel, Alicia Leal, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gabriel, Cesar Malic, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Palacios, Jaime J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePalacios, Jaime J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children (Oca) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Proposed Order
Date: July 14, 2020Proposed Order
Date: March 17, 2020Amended Judgment Signed
Date: July 16, 2020Proposed Order
Date: December 27, 2019Statement of Inability to Afford Payment
Date: December 26, 2019Original Petition for Divorce (OCA)
Date: December 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent AMENDMENT FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE AMENDMENT FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE Judge: Palacios, Jaime J. |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Judgment Signed AMENDMENT FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE AMENDMENT FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE Judge: Palacios, Jaime J. |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order AMENDMENT FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE AMENDMENT FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE Judge: Palacios, Jaime J. |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue AMENDMENT FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE AMENDMENT FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE Judge: Palacios, Jaime J. |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (1:00 PM) ()
Judge: Palacios, Jaime J. |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Parties reached agreement on property and debts. Ms. Alicia Gabriel present, pro se. Marriage dissolved. Divorce granted. Parties reached agreement on property and debts. Ms. Alicia Gabriel present, pro se. Marriage dissolved. Divorce granted. Judge: Palacios, Jaime J. |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING Judge: Palacios, Jaime J. |
|
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed FINAL HEARING FINAL HEARING Judge: Palacios, Jaime J. |
|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE Judge: Palacios, Jaime J. |
|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER SETTING HEARING ORDER SETTING HEARING Judge: Palacios, Jaime J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.