Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Munoz, Neida, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Munoz, Jaime, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Jaime E. Tijerina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJaime E. Tijerina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children (Oca) |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Motion
Date: December 28, 2020Proposed Order
Date: October 30, 2019Original Petition for Divorce (OCA)
Date: September 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Divorce Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Joe) | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Atty. Orlando Jimenz & Petitioner Neida Munoz present via zoom; Court has granted Final Divorce Decree; Atty.. Jimenez is to re-submit Final Decree for Judge's signature; Atty. Orlando Jimenz & Petitioner Neida Munoz present via zoom; Court has granted Final Divorce Decree; Atty.. Jimenez is to re-submit Final Decree for Judge's signature; |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent FINAL HEARING FINAL HEARING |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed FINAL HEARING FINAL HEARING |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Entries ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING REJECTED (ENV #49263741) NO CC TO RESPONDENT. -AG ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING REJECTED (ENV #49263741) NO CC TO RESPONDENT. -AG |
|
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR FINAL HEARING FOR FINAL HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.