Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Huynh, Cuong Chi, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Nguyen, Yen Thi, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Federico Garza, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 10, 2023 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children (Oca) |
Last RefreshedJuly 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: June 12, 2023Notice Sent
Date: June 15, 2023Answer
Date: April 11, 2023Waiver of Service
Date: April 11, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: April 11, 2023Proposed Order
Date: April 11, 2023Affidavit for Prove-Up of Agreed Divorce
Date: April 11, 2023Receipt
Date: April 10, 2023Original Petition for Divorce (OCA)
Date: April 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Case was called for hrg. and Respondent Yen Thi Mguyen appeared in person and court approved Divorce and Final Decree of Divorce to be signed. Case was called for hrg. and Respondent Yen Thi Mguyen appeared in person and court approved Divorce and Final Decree of Divorce to be signed. |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Final Decree of Divorce, signed. Final Decree of Divorce, signed. |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Garza, Federico "Fred", Jr.) Divorce - No Children 06/29/2023 Reset by Court to 06/30/2023 Divorce - No Children |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing, Signed | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing On Status Hearing on Divorce, signed and set for hrg. on 06-29-2023 @ 11:00 a.m. On Status Hearing on Divorce, signed and set for hrg. on 06-29-2023 @ 11:00 a.m. |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Will be Issued by the Court Clerk. Will be Issued by the Court Clerk. |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.