Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Garcia, Monica Yvette, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Garcia, Rolando, represented by Horacio Pena, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Mancias, Fernando G presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2022 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDecree Of Divorce |
Final Decree of Divorce, Signed
Date: October 21, 2022Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Date: October 21, 2022Amended
Date: September 27, 2022Notice Sent
Date: September 23, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: September 23, 2022Notice Sent
Date: September 23, 2022Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: August 11, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: September 23, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: September 21, 2022Response
Date: September 21, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: September 21, 2022Motion for Entry of Order
Date: September 21, 2022Notice Sent
Date: May 13, 2022Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: August 10, 2022Order on Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel, Signed
Date: May 04, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: August 09, 2022Notice Sent
Date: August 09, 2022Motion for Substitution of Counsel, Filed
Date: May 02, 2022Certificate
Date: August 05, 2022Order Returned by Court
Date: April 26, 2022Order on Motion for Substitution of Counsel, Signed
Date: May 13, 2022Notice Sent
Date: May 06, 2022Proposed Order
Date: May 02, 2022Motion
Date: April 25, 2022Proposed Order
Date: April 25, 2022Proposed Order
Date: April 25, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: April 25, 2022Motion for Final Hearing
Date: April 25, 2022Mediator's Report
Date: April 20, 2022Notice Sent
Date: February 16, 2022Temporary Restraining Order, Signed
Date: February 15, 2022Rule 11 Agreement Reviewed and Returned by Court
Date: March 09, 2022Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: March 02, 2022Respondent's Original Answer
Date: February 10, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: January 31, 2022Request
Date: January 14, 2022Notice Sent
Date: February 01, 2022Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed
Date: February 01, 2022TRO Issued
Date: January 19, 2022Notice Sent
Date: January 19, 2022Temporary Restraining Order, Signed
Date: January 19, 2022Affidavit
Date: January 14, 2022Original Petition for Divorce (OCA)
Date: January 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce, Signed
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent AGREED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE AGREED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Mancias, Fernando G) MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Mancias, Fernando G) RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE & OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION & ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES & COSTS RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE & OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION & ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES & COSTS Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended RESPONDENT'S AMENDED RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS RESPONDENT'S AMENDED RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ON RESPONDENTS RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND RESPONDENTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS ORDER SETTING HEARING ON RESPONDENTS RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND RESPONDENTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed ORDER SETTING HEARING ON RESPONDENTS RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND RESPONDENTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS ORDER SETTING HEARING ON RESPONDENTS RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND RESPONDENTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER SETTING HEARING ON RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS ORDER SETTING HEARING ON RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.