Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Barrs, Melinda, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Omar Ochoa, against Allstate Vehicle And Property Insurance Company, represented by Mario Palacios, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 03, 2023 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt (Oca) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is a binding stipulation of damages in a civil action. The plaintiffs and their attorneys agree that the total sum or value in controversy in this case does not exceed $75,000, including interests, costs, and attorney's fees. They also...
Citation Issued
Date: October 03, 2023Service Returned - Served
Date: October 10, 2023Order Filed
Date: November 03, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: January 04, 2024Rule 11 Agreement
Date: February 02, 2024Motion
Date: November 03, 2023Answer
Date: October 24, 2023Order Filed
Date: November 03, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: November 14, 2023Original Petition (OCA)
Date: October 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel (1:00 PM) () PLF'S M/COMPEL MEDIATION PLF'S M/COMPEL MEDIATION |
|
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement Rule 11 Passing Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Mediation Rule 11 Passing Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Mediation |
|
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed NOTICE TO COURT RE FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS CHANGE NOTICE TO COURT RE FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS CHANGE |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION |
|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER AND REQUEST FOR INITIAL DISCLOSURE DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER AND REQUEST FOR INITIAL DISCLOSURE |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Returned - Served | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.