Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Gonzalez, Laurie, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Omar Ochoa, against Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, represented by Patrick M Kemp, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2023 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt (Oca) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is a binding stipulation of damages in a civil action. The plaintiff and their attorneys agree that the total sum or value in controversy in this case does not exceed $75,000, including interests, costs, and attorney's fees. They also ...
Citation Issued
Date: October 03, 2023Service Returned - Served
Date: October 12, 2023Answer
Date: November 06, 2023Answer
Date: November 02, 2023Original Petition (OCA)
Date: September 29, 2023Motion
Date: November 27, 2023Rule 11 Agreement
Date: December 15, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: December 08, 2023Order Filed
Date: November 27, 2023Order Filed
Date: November 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel (1:00 PM) () Mediation Mediation |
|
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement Rule 11 Passing 1/22 Hearing Rule 11 Passing 1/22 Hearing |
|
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL MEDIATION |
|
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed ORDER GRANTING MEDIATION ORDER GRANTING MEDIATION |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Filed | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer Gonzalez, Laurie - NMIC's First Amended Answer Gonzalez, Laurie - NMIC's First Amended Answer |
|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer Gonzalez, Laurie - NMIC's Original Answer Gonzalez, Laurie - NMIC's Original Answer |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Returned - Served | |
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.