Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Gonzalez, Abelardo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Juan Francisco Frank Guerra, against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by Benjamin Adam Neece, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 21, 2023 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Other
Date: November 03, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: October 06, 2023Other
Date: November 03, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: October 06, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: November 03, 2023Other
Date: October 06, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: October 06, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: December 22, 2023Other
Date: October 06, 2023Other
Date: November 09, 2023Other
Date: October 06, 2023Answer
Date: September 25, 2023Service Returned - Served
Date: September 13, 2023Citation Issued
Date: August 21, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: October 06, 2023Affidavit
Date: October 06, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: October 06, 2023Order Signed
Date: September 25, 2023Other
Date: October 06, 2023Original Petition (OCA)
Date: August 21, 2023Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: November 09, 2023Other
Date: October 27, 2023Other
Date: October 06, 2023Service Returned - Served
Date: September 18, 2023Other
Date: October 06, 2023Motion
Date: September 25, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: December 05, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: December 06, 2023Other
Date: October 06, 2023Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: December 22, 2023Request
Date: November 09, 2023Other
Date: October 27, 2023Other
Date: October 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Trial (1:30 PM) () | |
September 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (1:30 PM) () | |
August 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Hearing (9:30 AM) () Mandatory Status: PT 09/05/2024 T 09/09/2024. Mandatory Status: PT 09/05/2024 T 09/09/2024. |
|
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Tickler (9:00 AM) () DCO tbs by Erika with Plaintiff Counsel. DCO tbs by Erika with Plaintiff Counsel. |
|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Docket Control Conference Hearing/Telephonic (9:00 AM) () | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed Abelardo Gonzalez' Answers and Responses to Interrogatories and Production Abelardo Gonzalez' Answers and Responses to Interrogatories and Production |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery Abelardo Gonzalez Certificate of Written Discovery Abelardo Gonzalez Certificate of Written Discovery |
|
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Affidavit from STHS ER at Monte Cristo Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Affidavit from STHS ER at Monte Cristo |
|
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed Defts Notice of Intent to take Oral Depo of Plf Abelardo Gonzalez Defts Notice of Intent to take Oral Depo of Plf Abelardo Gonzalez |
|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Other Plaintiff's Interrogatories Plaintiff's Interrogatories |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.