Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Gc Steel & Accessories, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by John Andrew Rigney, against Ibc Bank, Rgv Five Star Concrete, Llc, Rio Bank, represented by Juan M. Pequeno, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2023 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract (Oca) |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Service Returned - Served
Date: December 06, 2023Writ of Garnishment
Date: December 04, 2023Order, Signed
Date: October 02, 2023Original Petition (OCA)
Date: July 26, 2023Writ of Execution
Date: December 04, 2023Answer
Date: December 28, 2023Writ of Garnishment
Date: December 04, 2023Citation Issued
Date: July 27, 2023Citation Returned Served
Date: August 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer Garnishee Rio Bank's Original Answer Garnishee Rio Bank's Original Answer |
|
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned - Served Writ of Garnishment Writ of Garnishment |
|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RIO BANK Writ of Garnishment WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RIO BANK |
|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution WRIT OF EXECUTION | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT IBC BANK Writ of Garnishment WRIT OF GARNISHMENT IBC BANK |
|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment IBC BANK Unserved | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment RIO BANK Unserved | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution RGV Five Star Concrete, LLC Unserved | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed Order Granting Garnishment IBC Bank M/O TO DEF Order Granting Garnishment IBC Bank M/O TO DEF |
|
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed Order Granting Garnishment Rio Bank M/O TO DEF Order Granting Garnishment Rio Bank M/O TO DEF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.