Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
First Portfolio Ventures Ii, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Janet B Turay, against Garcia, Idalia, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Ricardo Rodriguez, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRicardo Rodriguez, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2023 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract (Oca) |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is a letter addressed to the Clerk of the County Court in Hidalgo County, Texas. The letter is from ABC Legal Services on behalf of First Portfolio Ventures II, LLC, who is filing a civil case against IDALIA GARCIA. The letter includes...
Order, Signed
Date: August 23, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: June 20, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: June 13, 2023Request
Date: June 12, 2023Motion
Date: June 12, 2023Service Returned - Served
Date: March 03, 2023Citation Issued
Date: February 28, 2023Original Petition (OCA)
Date: February 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed DEFAULT JUDGMENT, MAILED OUT TO DEF. -BH DEFAULT JUDGMENT, MAILED OUT TO DEF. -BH |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Hearing (9:00 AM) () Filed:02/27/2023 Issued:02/28/2023 Served:03/03/2023 No Answer Filed Filed:02/27/2023 Issued:02/28/2023 Served:03/03/2023 No Answer Filed |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER- DJ ORDER- DJ |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Called Atty Ricardo Rodriguez present for Pltf; Defendant Idalia Garcia not present; Default Judgment entered into the record. Court granted DJ; otbs. Atty Ricardo Rodriguez present for Pltf; Defendant Idalia Garcia not present; Default Judgment entered into the record. Court granted DJ; otbs. |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing notice of hearing | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed Order setting Hearing- Default Judgment. Mailed to Defendant Order setting Hearing- Default Judgment. Mailed to Defendant |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Trial Setting Request Request for Trial Setting |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue OSH OSH |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion to Enter Default Judgment Plaintiff's Motion to Enter Default Judgment |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned - Served Return of Service Return of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.