Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Rodriguez, Feliza M, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Javier Pena, against Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co., in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law #5.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2023 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other (Oca) |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law #5 |
Other
Date: April 18, 2023Other
Date: March 08, 2023Citation Issued
Date: February 07, 2023Answer
Date: March 08, 2023Motion
Date: March 26, 2024Order, Signed
Date: April 09, 2024Vacation Letter Filed by Attorneys
Date: June 12, 2023Original Petition (OCA)
Date: February 06, 2023Motion
Date: June 02, 2023Service Returned - Served
Date: March 30, 2023Order, Signed
Date: April 09, 2024Order Filed
Date: July 03, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: April 02, 2024Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: June 08, 2023Other
Date: April 30, 2024Motion
Date: March 26, 2024Motion
Date: July 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel (10:00 AM) () defs' Result: Held defs' |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Called crt reporter tina fasci; attys javier pena, kevin sanchez & harry church. arguments presented to the court. parties to continue talking. crt reporter tina fasci; attys javier pena, kevin sanchez & harry church. arguments presented to the court. parties to continue talking. |
|
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Other Non Party OnStar Objections to DWQ and SDT and Response to Motion to Compel Service Records Non Party OnStar Objections to DWQ and SDT and Response to Motion to Compel Service Records |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed NOTICE OF HEARING (TD AUTO FIANNCE) NOTICE OF HEARING (TD AUTO FIANNCE) |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed NOTICE OF HEARING (ONSTARS SERVICE RECORDS) NOTICE OF HEARING (ONSTARS SERVICE RECORDS) |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing defs' mtn to compel set for hrg on 5/1/24 @ 10am defs' mtn to compel set for hrg on 5/1/24 @ 10am |
|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Def Progressive's MTC TD Auto Finance Recs Def Progressive's MTC TD Auto Finance Recs |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Def Progressive's MTC OnStar's Service Records Def Progressive's MTC OnStar's Service Records |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SEVERANCE AND ABATEMENT ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SEVERANCE AND ABATEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.