Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Lopez, Esmeralda Villarreal, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Ricardo Rodriguez, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRicardo Rodriguez, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2022 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract (Oca) |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Citation Issued
Date: December 14, 2022Answer
Date: January 24, 2023Order Filed
Date: June 15, 2023Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 13, 2022Request
Date: June 28, 2023Affidavit
Date: August 01, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: July 17, 2023Order, Signed
Date: November 22, 2023Motion
Date: June 15, 2023Order, Signed
Date: June 29, 2023Order Signed
Date: December 05, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: June 15, 2023Order Filed
Date: June 28, 2023Request
Date: November 21, 2023Order Filed
Date: November 21, 2023Order Filed
Date: August 01, 2023Other
Date: June 15, 2023Service Returned - Served
Date: January 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Signed AGREED JUDGMENT AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Coordinator Note ATTY RICARDO RODRIGUEZ SUBMITTED AN AGREED JUDGMENT SIGNED BY ALL PARTIES IN OPEN COURT ATTY RICARDO RODRIGUEZ SUBMITTED AN AGREED JUDGMENT SIGNED BY ALL PARTIES IN OPEN COURT |
|
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Conference Hearing (9:00 AM) () 11/20/2023 Reset by Court to 12/05/2023 | |
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed ORDER FOR ORAL HEARING, M/O TO BOTH PARTIES ORDER FOR ORAL HEARING, M/O TO BOTH PARTIES |
|
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Request REQUEST | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed ORDER ORDER |
|
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Conference Hearing (10:00 AM) () | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion For Summary Judgment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Rodolfo "Rudy") Result: Passed | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit OPPOPSITION FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OPPOPSITION FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.