Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
As Next Friend Of P.V., A Minor, Antonio Garcia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ricardo P Rodriguez, against Martinez-Carrera, Adela, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Ricardo Rodriguez, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRicardo Rodriguez, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 10, 2022 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Order, Signed
Date: February 09, 2023Other
Date: February 06, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: January 06, 2023Order, Signed
Date: January 05, 2023Order Filed
Date: January 03, 2023Order Filed
Date: November 16, 2022Motion
Date: November 16, 2022Original Petition (OCA)
Date: November 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trust Deposit 50/38 CK#38578 $9,112.91 REC#2023-002077 P.V., minor. 50/38 CK#38578 $9,112.91 REC#2023-002077 P.V., minor. |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed Order Approving Minors' Settlement and Agreed Final Judgment Order Approving Minors' Settlement and Agreed Final Judgment |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Friendly Suit (8:30 AM) () AD LITEM: RICARDO RODRIGUEZ JR Result: Held AD LITEM: RICARDO RODRIGUEZ JR |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER APPROVING MINOR'S SETTLEMENT AND AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER APPROVING MINOR'S SETTLEMENT AND AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Other Guardian Ad Litem Report Guardian Ad Litem Report |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue GUARDIAN AD LITEM REPORT GUARDIAN AD LITEM REPORT |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ORDER SETTING FRIENDLY SUIT HEARING ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ORDER SETTING FRIENDLY SUIT HEARING |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem for Minor Child Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem for Minor Child |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM FOR MINOR CHILD ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM FOR MINOR CHILD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.