Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Perez, Maria, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Bobby Garcia, against Advanced Cardiac And Trauma Emergency Medical Services, Intercity Ambulance For Emergency Medical Transport, Llc, U.S. Renal Care, Inc., represented by Chastiti N. Horne, James M. Thompson, Rafael Garcia, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2022 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other (Oca) |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Original Petition (OCA)
Date: September 13, 2022Motion
Date: August 02, 2023Citation Issued
Date: September 15, 2022Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: January 26, 2024Order, Signed
Date: August 09, 2023Citation Issued
Date: February 01, 2023Service Returned - Served
Date: February 07, 2023Motion
Date: January 24, 2024Motion
Date: September 11, 2023Order, Signed
Date: February 13, 2024Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: March 01, 2024Order, Signed
Date: March 01, 2024Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: February 05, 2024Motion
Date: January 24, 2024Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: May 26, 2023Request
Date: February 21, 2023Rule 11 Agreement
Date: September 14, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: January 31, 2024Rule 11 Agreement
Date: January 26, 2024Order, Signed
Date: November 21, 2023Amended
Date: September 12, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: December 27, 2023Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: June 21, 2023Order Filed
Date: January 24, 2024Amended
Date: February 08, 2024Answer
Date: November 29, 2022Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: September 06, 2023Order Filed
Date: August 02, 2023Answer
Date: February 21, 2023Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: March 23, 2023Order Filed
Date: January 24, 2024Service Returned - Served
Date: October 26, 2022Answer
Date: November 18, 2022Amended
Date: January 31, 2023Order Signed
Date: May 16, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: March 01, 2024Order Signed
Date: May 31, 2023Citation Issued
Date: September 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Trial on Merits Other CANCELED Trial on Merits (1:30 PM) () Other |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Trial on Merits (1:30 PM) () | |
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing Other CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (1:30 PM) () Other |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (1:30 PM) () | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Hearing Other CANCELED Status Conference Hearing (9:00 AM) () Other ***Mandatory Trial Status*** Pre-Trial: 04/18/2024 Trial: 04/22/22024 |
|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Hearing (9:00 AM) () ***Mandatory Trial Status*** Pre-Trial: 04/18/2024 Trial: 04/22/22024 ***Mandatory Trial Status*** Pre-Trial: 04/18/2024 Trial: 04/22/22024 |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Docket Control Conference Hearing/Telephonic (2:30 PM) () | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed SECOND CROSS-NOTICE OF DEFENDANT U.S. RENAL CARE, INC???S NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE THE ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF MARIA PEREZ SECOND CROSS-NOTICE OF DEFENDANT U.S. RENAL CARE, INC???S NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE THE ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF MARIA PEREZ |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed Order Re-Setting Telephonic Docket Control Conference Order Re-Setting Telephonic Docket Control Conference |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed PLAINTIFF???S NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE THE ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF RICARDO F. VAIZ WITH SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM PLAINTIFF???S NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE THE ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF RICARDO F. VAIZ WITH SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.