Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Perez, Maria, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Douglas E. Pennebaker, against Allstate Texas Lloyd'S, represented by Rosemary Conrad Sandoval, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 29, 2022 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Letter of Mediation
Date: September 13, 2023Rule 11 Agreement
Date: July 25, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: July 24, 2023Order, Signed
Date: May 12, 2023Order Filed
Date: May 09, 2023Answer
Date: May 27, 2022Motion
Date: May 09, 2023Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: February 08, 2023Service Returned - Served
Date: May 09, 2022Original Petition (OCA)
Date: April 29, 2022Citation Issued
Date: May 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter of Mediation Mediation Status Report Mediation Status Report |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Other CANCELED Motion to Compel (10:00 AM) () Other Mediation (Plf's) 06/07/2023 Reset by Court to 07/26/2023 |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement RULE 11 RULE 11 |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed Rule 11 Agreement Passing Hearing Rule 11 Agreement Passing Hearing |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel (10:00 AM) () Mediation (Plf's) Mediation (Plf's) |
|
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION COMPEL - set for 6/7/2023 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION COMPEL - set for 6/7/2023 |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Proposed Order Proposed Order |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Motion | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition Reporter's Certification of Jose Perez Reporter's Certification of Jose Perez |
|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer Defendant Allstate's Original Answer, Specific and Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand Defendant Allstate's Original Answer, Specific and Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.