Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
First Acquisition, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Rothbard, Todd Bennett, against Parks, Jodell, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Francisca P. Tisher presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 15, 2009 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer Residential Limited (32) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions11 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time11 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ (Filed) 236120-Writ: Filed Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service WRIT: FILED [236120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Court Trial: Short Cause 251110-Court Trial: Short Cause; First Acquisition, LLC vs. Parks, J. ; Judge: J21160 Tisher Francisca P. Judge: Tisher, Francisca P. |
|
June 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) 236110-Writ: Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: ISSUED [236110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
June 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Default 226130-Judgment: Default Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff JUDGMENT: DEFAULT [226130] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
June 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default 229120-Request: Default Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff REQUEST: DEFAULT [229120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
June 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Jun 26 2009 Type: 244210 - Judgment: Clerk Default Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 212310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff PROOF OF SERVICE [212310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet 212350-Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET [212350] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 212920-Notice of Hearing Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk NOTICE OF HEARING [212920] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed 212210-Complaint Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff COMPLAINT [212210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.