Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Cantu, Beatrice, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Arturo R. Cantu, against Saldivar, Ricardo, represented by Nicholas O. Denzer, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law #7.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law #7 |
Answer
Date: March 22, 2023Original Petition (OCA)
Date: August 27, 2021Motion
Date: November 18, 2021Order, Signed
Date: April 03, 2023Service Returned - Served
Date: December 13, 2021Citation Issued
Date: August 30, 2021Order Filed
Date: December 02, 2021Motion
Date: March 08, 2023Order, Signed
Date: April 03, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: February 07, 2024Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: June 27, 2023Motion
Date: January 25, 2024Order, Signed
Date: November 29, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: October 30, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: July 20, 2023Certification
Date: December 04, 2023Order, Signed
Date: February 06, 2024Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: March 08, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion for Entry (8:30 AM) () | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel (8:30 AM) () Result: Held | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Status Conference Hearing (8:30 AM) () | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed Notice of Intention to Take DWQ Notice of Intention to Take DWQ |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed CR to Court MTC no longer Necessary CR to Court MTC no longer Necessary |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue LETTER TO COURT LETTER TO COURT |
|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed OSH Def Mtn to Compel OSH Def Mtn to Compel |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Other CANCELED Jury Trial (8:30 AM) () Other |
|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) () MEDIATOR: PABLO GARZA Result: Held MEDIATOR: PABLO GARZA |
|
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Def Mtn to Compel Def Mtn to Compel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.