Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Garcia, Esmeralda C, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Miguel Angel, against Aep Texas Inc, American Electrical Power, At&T Inc., Camacho, Robert E, Horton, Jonathan, (total of 11) See All represented by Joe Escobedo, Jr., Jose E Garcia, Jose Escobedo, Jr., Marc A. Notzon, Melissa Osio Martinez, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Valdez, Sergio Party(AT&T INC. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other (Oca) |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Original Petition (OCA)
Date: February 10, 2021Motion
Date: January 05, 2022Answer
Date: November 10, 2021Motion
Date: December 20, 2021Answer
Date: September 30, 2021Service Returned - Served
Date: September 03, 2021Amended
Date: August 25, 2021Service Returned - Served
Date: September 03, 2021Citation Issued
Date: August 26, 2021Citation Issued
Date: August 26, 2021Answer
Date: April 06, 2021Answer
Date: March 26, 2021Other
Date: July 12, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: July 21, 2022Order Filed
Date: July 12, 2022Answer
Date: June 27, 2022Answer
Date: June 27, 2022Answer
Date: June 27, 2022Answer
Date: June 27, 2022Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: June 27, 2022Answer
Date: June 24, 2022Answer
Date: June 24, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: June 22, 2022Answer
Date: June 16, 2022Citation Returned Served
Date: June 13, 2022Service Returned - Served
Date: June 11, 2022Service Returned - Served
Date: June 02, 2022Answer
Date: June 10, 2022Citation Issued
Date: June 01, 2022Citation Issued
Date: June 01, 2022Citation Issued
Date: June 01, 2022Citation Issued
Date: June 01, 2022Certification
Date: April 20, 2022Citation Issued
Date: June 01, 2022Citation Issued
Date: June 01, 2022Amended
Date: May 24, 2022Citation Issued
Date: June 01, 2022Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: February 25, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: February 03, 2022Response
Date: December 01, 2022Certification
Date: December 01, 2022Certification
Date: November 30, 2022Amended
Date: November 30, 2022Order, Signed
Date: November 22, 2022Certification
Date: November 18, 2022Order Filed
Date: November 17, 2022Motion
Date: November 17, 2022Motion
Date: November 17, 2022Other
Date: November 15, 2022Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: September 09, 2022Order Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Order Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Motion
Date: September 08, 2022Motion
Date: September 02, 2022Motion
Date: September 02, 2022Vacation Letter Filed by Attorneys
Date: August 30, 2022Motion
Date: August 26, 2022Motion
Date: August 23, 2022Certification
Date: August 18, 2022Amended
Date: August 10, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: August 09, 2022Order of Referral for Mediation, Signed
Date: August 02, 2022Motion
Date: August 04, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: August 02, 2022Order Filed
Date: August 08, 2022Rule 11 Agreement
Date: July 29, 2022Response
Date: July 29, 2022Other
Date: March 15, 2023Rule 11 Agreement
Date: March 15, 2023Motion
Date: March 03, 2023Order, Signed
Date: March 07, 2023Order, Signed
Date: March 07, 2023Other
Date: March 10, 2023Other
Date: March 06, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: March 03, 2023Motion
Date: March 03, 2023Amended Order, Signed
Date: February 27, 2023Rule 11 Agreement
Date: February 15, 2023Order, Signed
Date: February 28, 2023Motion
Date: February 14, 2023Order Filed
Date: February 08, 2023Motion
Date: February 08, 2023Other
Date: February 03, 2023Certification
Date: January 27, 2023Order, Signed
Date: January 26, 2023Order, Signed
Date: January 26, 2023Response
Date: January 25, 2023Order Filed
Date: January 25, 2023Response
Date: January 24, 2023Response
Date: January 25, 2023Response
Date: January 25, 2023Order Filed
Date: January 25, 2023Response
Date: January 24, 2023Motion
Date: January 24, 2023Order Filed
Date: January 20, 2023Motion
Date: January 23, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: January 10, 2023Order Filed
Date: January 12, 2023Order Filed
Date: January 06, 2023Order Filed
Date: January 06, 2023Motion
Date: January 06, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: January 05, 2023Amended
Date: January 03, 2023Order Filed
Date: January 03, 2023Amended
Date: January 03, 2023Order Filed
Date: January 03, 2023Order Filed
Date: January 03, 2023Amended Motion
Date: January 03, 2023Motion
Date: January 03, 2023Amended
Date: January 03, 2023Amended
Date: December 29, 2022Amended
Date: December 29, 2022Order Filed
Date: December 29, 2022Motion
Date: December 29, 2022Motion
Date: December 29, 2022Order Filed
Date: December 29, 2022Amended Answer
Date: December 29, 2022Order Filed
Date: December 29, 2022Amended
Date: December 29, 2022Amended
Date: December 22, 2022Order Filed
Date: December 07, 2022Order, Signed
Date: December 20, 2022Response
Date: December 07, 2022Response
Date: December 06, 2022Order Filed
Date: December 07, 2022Order Filed
Date: December 07, 2022Amended
Date: December 06, 2022Response
Date: December 05, 2022Response
Date: December 05, 2022Order, Signed
Date: November 15, 2022Other
Date: November 14, 2022Order Filed
Date: November 14, 2022Order, Signed
Date: November 10, 2022Order, Signed
Date: November 07, 2022Motion
Date: November 09, 2022Order, Signed
Date: November 07, 2022Answer
Date: October 28, 2022Motion
Date: October 27, 2022Order Filed
Date: October 20, 2022Motion
Date: October 21, 2022Motion
Date: October 19, 2022Order Filed
Date: October 19, 2022Response
Date: October 19, 2022Response
Date: October 19, 2022Response
Date: October 19, 2022Response
Date: October 19, 2022Order Filed
Date: October 04, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: October 04, 2022Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: September 29, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: October 03, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: October 03, 2022Motion
Date: September 29, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: September 29, 2022Motion
Date: September 29, 2022Response
Date: September 28, 2022Response
Date: September 27, 2022Order, Signed
Date: September 26, 2022Motion
Date: September 23, 2022Order Signed
Date: September 22, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: September 22, 2022Order, Signed
Date: September 22, 2022Response
Date: September 21, 2022Motion
Date: September 21, 2022Answer
Date: September 21, 2022Answer
Date: September 21, 2022Motion
Date: September 21, 2022Motion
Date: September 20, 2022Order Filed
Date: September 20, 2022Motion
Date: September 20, 2022Amended Petition
Date: September 20, 2022Motion
Date: September 16, 2022Letter of Mediation
Date: September 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Entry (8:30 AM) ()
Judge: Valdez, Sergio Party(AT&T INC. |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Other CANCELED Jury Trial (8:30 AM) () Other MEDIATOR: DANIEL HERNANDEZ Judge: Valdez, Sergio Party(AT&T INC. |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (8:30 AM) () MEDIATOR: DANIEL HERNANDEZ MEDIATOR: DANIEL HERNANDEZ Judge: Valdez, Sergio Party(AT&T INC. |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing Other CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) () Other Judge: Valdez, Sergio Party(AT&T INC. |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) ()
Judge: Valdez, Sergio Party(AT&T INC. |
|
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing (8:30 AM) () DEF. INLAND CONSULTING SERVICES MOTION TO STRIKE LIMIT OR EXCLUDE CERTAIN TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF EXPERT WITNESS DEF. INLAND CONSULTING SERVICES MOTION TO STRIKE LIMIT OR EXCLUDE CERTAIN TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF EXPERT WITNESS Judge: Valdez, Sergio Party(AT&T INC. |
|
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing (8:30 AM) () DEF. INLAND CONSULTING SERVICES LLC MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO DEF. SECOND AND THIRD REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DEF. INLAND CONSULTING SERVICES LLC MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO DEF. SECOND AND THIRD REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Judge: Valdez, Sergio Party(AT&T INC. |
|
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing (8:30 AM) () MOTION'S TO RECONSIDER MSJ 03/16/2023 Reset by Court to 03/16/2023 MOTION'S TO RECONSIDER MSJ Judge: Valdez, Sergio Party(AT&T INC. |
|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Other Mediation Status Report Mediation Status Report Judge: Valdez, Sergio Party(AT&T INC. |
|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement - Inland's Discovery Requests to Spectrum Rule 11 Agreement Rule 11 Agreement - Inland's Discovery Requests to Spectrum Judge: Valdez, Sergio Party(AT&T INC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.