Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Torres, Maria, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Christopher R Vasquez, against Tapia, Daniel Olmos, represented by Aron D Garza, Aron D. Garza, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 08, 2020 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Other
Date: May 09, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 26, 2022Motion
Date: February 14, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 26, 2022Certification
Date: February 28, 2022Motion
Date: February 14, 2022Certification
Date: January 18, 2022Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: August 04, 2021Certification
Date: February 04, 2022Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: July 06, 2021Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: March 24, 2021Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: March 18, 2021Order, Signed
Date: March 18, 2021Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: February 08, 2021Motion
Date: March 09, 2021Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: February 09, 2021Service Returned - Served
Date: October 26, 2020Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: December 22, 2020Answer
Date: November 09, 2020Citation Issued
Date: October 14, 2020Original Petition (OCA)
Date: October 08, 2020Rule 11 Agreement
Date: August 19, 2022Amended Answer
Date: August 19, 2022Order Filed
Date: August 19, 2022Answer
Date: August 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (8:30 AM) () MEDIATOR: JOHN TIPPIT MEDIATOR: JOHN TIPPIT |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) () | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing (8:30 AM) () DEF. MOTION TO COMPEL Result: Rule 11 Filed DEF. MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing (8:30 AM) () DEF. MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLTFS DESIGNATED TESTIFYING EXPERTS REGARDING REASONABLENESS CHARGE FOR MEDICAL SERVICES Result: Rule 11 Filed DEF. MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLTFS DESIGNATED TESTIFYING EXPERTS REGARDING REASONABLENESS CHARGE FOR MEDICAL SERVICES |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement Received- Rule 11 Agreement re passing hearing on August 22nd on Defendant's Motion to Exclude and Motion to Compel Received- Rule 11 Agreement re passing hearing on August 22nd on Defendant's Motion to Exclude and Motion to Compel |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer Plaintiff's Amended Response to Defendant's Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Designated Testifying Experts Plaintiff's Amended Response to Defendant's Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Designated Testifying Experts |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Order Denying Defendant's Motion Order Denying Defendant's Motion |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue RULE 11 AGREEMENT RULE 11 AGREEMENT |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer Plf's Response to Defendant's Motion Plf's Response to Defendant's Motion |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Signed ORDER RE-SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL SENT VIA EMAIL ORDER RE-SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL SENT VIA EMAIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.