Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Department Stores National Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Shawn R. Redman, against Cooper, Rose Marie, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 09, 2020 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Letter Received
Date: September 12, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: May 13, 2022Other
Date: June 01, 2021Request
Date: May 28, 2021Order Filed
Date: May 28, 2021Motion for New Trial
Date: April 05, 2022Motion
Date: October 13, 2020Other
Date: October 13, 2020Order Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Request
Date: October 13, 2020Other
Date: April 04, 2022Service Returned - Served
Date: September 09, 2020Citation Issued
Date: July 10, 2020Original Petition (OCA)
Date: July 09, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 10, 2022Request
Date: April 05, 2022Other
Date: April 04, 2022Other
Date: April 04, 2022Motion to Reinstate Case, Filed
Date: April 04, 2022DWOP Order, Signed
Date: March 17, 2022DWOP Notice Sent
Date: February 03, 2022Order Filed
Date: December 07, 2021Order Filed
Date: June 01, 2021Request
Date: December 07, 2021Request
Date: June 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter Received COVER LETTER COVER LETTER |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing, Signed | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion For New Trial (8:30 AM) () Result: Granted | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORD REINSTATE SENT TO COURT ORD REINSTATE SENT TO COURT |
|
April 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed SET FOR 5/12/2022; MAILED TO DEF SET FOR 5/12/2022; MAILED TO DEF |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER FOR ORAL HEARING ORDER FOR ORAL HEARING |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for New Trial LETTER FOR FILING FEES MOTION TO NEW TRIAL LETTER FOR FILING FEES MOTION TO NEW TRIAL |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR HEARING Request REQUEST FOR HEARING |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Other Exhibit 3 Exhibit 3 |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Other Exhibit 2 Exhibit 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.