Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bank Of America N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pamela Schwarcz, against Leon, Richard, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt (Oca) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Other
Date: June 21, 2023Order, Signed
Date: June 26, 2023Request
Date: May 19, 2023Order, Signed
Date: April 19, 2023Motion to Reinstate Case, Filed
Date: April 27, 2023Order Filed
Date: February 24, 2023Motion
Date: February 24, 2023Order Filed
Date: April 27, 2023Other
Date: February 24, 2023Motion
Date: March 03, 2022Other
Date: March 03, 2022Answer
Date: February 03, 2020Citation Issued
Date: January 03, 2020Service Returned - Served
Date: January 13, 2020Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing (8:30 AM) () MOTION TO REINSTATE Result: Denied MOTION TO REINSTATE |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed Order setting Hearing (order) M/O TO DEF Order setting Hearing (order) M/O TO DEF |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Other Letter to Clerk Letter to Clerk |
|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request Order setting hearing Order setting hearing |
|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER SETTING HEARING ORDER SETTING HEARING |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Reinstate Case, Filed Motion to Reinstate Motion to Reinstate |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Motion to Reinstate Order Motion to Reinstate Order |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue MOTION TO REINSTATE ORDER MOTION TO REINSTATE ORDER |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal Want of Prosecution (8:30 AM) () 02/23/2023 Reset by Court to 03/02/2023 03/02/2023 Reset by Court to 04/13/2023 04/13/2023 Reset by Court to 04/13/2023 Result: Dismissed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.