Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hacienda Ventures Inc. D B A Hacienda Ford, filed a(n) All Other Civil Cases (Oca) case represented by Heather Scott, Ysmael D. Fonseca, against Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, Texas Department Of Motor Vehicles, Trevino, Alonzo, represented by Dora Alicia Garza, Robert J. Blech, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryAll Other Civil Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
|
Motion
Date: March 30, 2021Order, Signed
Date: April 12, 2021Motion
Date: February 08, 2021Order of Transfer, Signed
Date: December 17, 2020Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: January 15, 2021Amended Order, Signed
Date: December 22, 2020Amended
Date: December 16, 2020Order Filed
Date: December 03, 2020Order Filed
Date: October 16, 2020Order, Signed
Date: April 30, 2020Order Filed
Date: December 01, 2020Motion
Date: October 16, 2020Answer
Date: April 23, 2020Order, Signed
Date: May 26, 2020Order Filed
Date: April 20, 2020Order Filed
Date: April 09, 2020Order Filed
Date: April 15, 2020Motion
Date: April 09, 2020Amended
Date: April 09, 2020Answer
Date: April 06, 2020Order Filed
Date: April 09, 2020Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: March 23, 2020Service Returned - Served
Date: March 17, 2020Citation Issued
Date: March 09, 2020Clerk's Entry
Date: December 30, 2019Counter Claim/Counter Petition (Fee)
Date: March 02, 2020Order Filed
Date: December 27, 2019Affidavit
Date: December 27, 2019Answer
Date: February 12, 2020Affidavit
Date: December 27, 2019Affidavit
Date: December 27, 2019Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed Order Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Order Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue order dismissal order dismissal |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitution of Counsel Motion Motion for Substitution of Counsel |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue SUB COUNSEL SUB COUNSEL |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Signed Order Granting Motion for Substitution of Counsel Order Granting Motion for Substitution of Counsel |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed Notice of Appearance & Designation of Lead Counsel Notice of Appearance & Designation of Lead Counsel |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Order, Signed AMENDED ORDER FOR MEDIATION SIGNED AMENDED ORDER FOR MEDIATION SIGNED |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Transfer, Signed | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
amended order for mediation Amended amended order for mediation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.