Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Aguilera, Ricardo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Graciela Orellana, against Cano, Omar, Cano, Ottmar, represented by Janelle V. Caso, Roberto Colegio, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2019 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Order Filed
Date: October 26, 2020Other
Date: November 08, 2023Other
Date: November 13, 2023Other
Date: November 08, 2023Order Filed
Date: November 13, 2023Order, Signed
Date: November 28, 2022Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: November 02, 2020Amended
Date: January 14, 2021Order Filed
Date: November 08, 2023Order Filed
Date: November 13, 2023Service Returned - Served
Date: September 19, 2019Other
Date: November 08, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: January 11, 2021Amended
Date: December 05, 2019Other
Date: November 09, 2023Order Filed
Date: January 26, 2022Other
Date: November 13, 2023Order Filed
Date: November 21, 2022Answer
Date: January 08, 2020Order Filed
Date: February 01, 2021Order Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: November 30, 2020Order, Signed
Date: July 01, 2020Certification
Date: August 24, 2020Order, Signed
Date: October 10, 2019Citation Issued
Date: December 10, 2019Order, Signed
Date: May 18, 2020Service Returned - Served
Date: December 17, 2019Order Filed
Date: May 15, 2020Motion
Date: January 05, 2021Order Filed
Date: December 11, 2019Agreed Scheduling Order, Signed
Date: June 15, 2021Order Filed
Date: May 03, 2023Order Filed
Date: January 05, 2021Motion
Date: November 08, 2023Order Filed
Date: November 09, 2023Motion
Date: November 13, 2023Order, Signed
Date: October 27, 2020Order, Signed
Date: December 09, 2019Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: November 25, 2020Original Petition (OCA)
Date: August 28, 2019Order Filed
Date: December 05, 2019Order of Referral for Mediation, Signed
Date: February 08, 2021Certification
Date: February 10, 2021Order Filed
Date: June 26, 2020Order, Signed
Date: December 16, 2019Motion
Date: May 15, 2020Other
Date: May 15, 2020Order, Signed
Date: January 27, 2022Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: February 24, 2022Order, Signed
Date: June 12, 2023Order Filed
Date: May 15, 2020Motion
Date: November 21, 2022Citation Issued
Date: September 04, 2019Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: February 08, 2023Order Filed
Date: June 11, 2021Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: April 19, 2021Order Filed
Date: October 08, 2019Motion
Date: October 08, 2019Answer
Date: October 04, 2019Other
Date: May 19, 2020Order Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (10:00 AM) () | |
September 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (10:00 AM) () | |
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Control Conference Hearing/Telephonic (2:00 PM) () Result: Held | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Other DEF'S EXHIBIT LIST DEF'S EXHIBIT LIST |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed ORDER GRANTING MTN IN LIMINE ORDER GRANTING MTN IN LIMINE |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Filed | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Other DEF'S WITNESS LIST DEF'S WITNESS LIST |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion DEF'S MTN IN LIMINE DEF'S MTN IN LIMINE |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:00 AM) () (2-3 days) (2-3 days) |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) () 11/08/2023 Reset by Court to 11/13/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.