Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Godinez, Fortino B., filed a(n) All Other Civil Cases (Oca) case represented by Ricardo R. Godinez, against Sfm, Llc D B A Sprouts Farmers Market C O Corporation Service Company, Texas Workforce Commission C O General Counsel, represented by Kelly E. Preston, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law #4.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2018 |
CategoryAll Other Civil Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
|
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law #4 |
Answer
Date: January 25, 2019Order Filed
Date: January 11, 2024Order, Signed
Date: December 10, 2019Order Filed
Date: August 23, 2023Motion
Date: August 22, 2023Motion
Date: November 07, 2023Court Entries
Date: December 19, 2023Motion
Date: January 11, 2024Other
Date: April 01, 2019Order Filed
Date: January 11, 2024Order Filed
Date: September 19, 2023Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: May 22, 2023Order Filed
Date: August 22, 2023Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 18, 2018Order, Signed
Date: December 19, 2023Amended
Date: March 21, 2024Order Filed
Date: March 20, 2024Other
Date: March 18, 2024Order Filed
Date: February 27, 2024Citation Issued
Date: January 02, 2019Answer
Date: February 01, 2019Order, Signed
Date: March 22, 2024Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: March 21, 2024Order Filed
Date: March 11, 2024Order Filed
Date: March 11, 2024Order Filed
Date: March 22, 2024Motion
Date: March 20, 2024Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: September 22, 2023Order Filed
Date: March 21, 2024Order Filed
Date: March 20, 2024Motion
Date: March 20, 2024Order Filed
Date: December 10, 2019Motion
Date: March 11, 2024Order Filed
Date: March 22, 2024Motion
Date: December 10, 2019Citation Issued
Date: January 02, 2019Order Filed
Date: November 07, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: January 11, 2024Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: November 17, 2023Order Filed
Date: February 26, 2024Order Filed
Date: March 22, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) () **Order of NonSuit, signed on 03-22-2024.** **Order of NonSuit, signed on 03-22-2024.** |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:00 AM) () **Order of NonSuit, signed on 03-22-2024.** **Order of NonSuit, signed on 03-22-2024.** |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:00 AM) () Est: 1-2 days Est: 1-2 days |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:00 AM) () | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed order of nonsuit order of nonsuit |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Filed ord grant def mtn to exclude evidence ord grant def mtn to exclude evidence |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Filed order grant objection to mediation order grant objection to mediation |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed Order of NonSuit, signed. Order of NonSuit, signed. |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Filed order of nonsuit order of nonsuit |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Amended 20240321 TWCs Amended Pretrial Disclosures 20240321 TWCs Amended Pretrial Disclosures |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.