Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) All Other Civil Cases (Oca) case represented by Jessica Kim Olsen-Zhang, against Cantu, Maria, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Armando J. Marroquin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryAll Other Civil Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
|
Order Filed
Date: February 18, 2020Motion
Date: January 18, 2019Request
Date: December 29, 2016Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: January 14, 2022Order of Transfer, Signed
Date: December 28, 2020Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 29, 2016Order Filed
Date: February 18, 2020Citation Issued
Date: January 03, 2017Service Returned - Served
Date: January 24, 2017Order Filed
Date: January 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment, Signed SENT VIA EMAIL/MAILED COPY. SENT VIA EMAIL/MAILED COPY. |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue Default Judgment Default Judgment |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Marroquin, Armando) Result: Granted | |
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Marroquin, Armando) | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed Default Judgment Default Judgment |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue OSH OSH |
|
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Transfer, Signed | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Order Setting Hearing Order Setting Hearing |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Filed ORDER SETTING HEARING ORDER SETTING HEARING |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Entry AS PER COURT NEED TO ADD CC'S AT THE BOTTOM BEFORE COURT CAN SET HEARING; NEED DEFENDANTS INFORMATION NAME AND ADDRESS AS PER COURT NEED TO ADD CC'S AT THE BOTTOM BEFORE COURT CAN SET HEARING; NEED DEFENDANTS INFORMATION NAME AND ADDRESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.