Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cuellar, Maria Catarina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ezequiel Reyna, Jr., against Loya Insurance Company, represented by John R. Lyde, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with E. Omar Maldonado presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: May 02, 2018Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: December 27, 2017Motion
Date: January 03, 2018Order, Signed
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: December 15, 2017Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: December 07, 2017Letter Received
Date: November 06, 2017Amended
Date: October 10, 2017Other
Date: October 20, 2017Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: October 04, 2017Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: October 10, 2017Motion
Date: September 29, 2017Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: September 28, 2017Order Signed
Date: September 20, 2017Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: August 31, 2017Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: August 28, 2017Service Returned - Served
Date: August 23, 2017Motion
Date: August 21, 2017Other
Date: August 15, 2017Order Filed
Date: August 14, 2017Motion
Date: August 14, 2017Other
Date: August 11, 2017Other
Date: August 10, 2017Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: June 28, 2017Other
Date: July 06, 2017Order Signed
Date: March 15, 2017Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: February 03, 2017Vacation Letter Filed by Attorneys
Date: March 28, 2017Motion
Date: February 03, 2017Amended
Date: February 01, 2017Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: January 27, 2017Request
Date: January 27, 2017Order Filed
Date: January 27, 2017Answer
Date: January 27, 2017Service Returned - Served
Date: January 12, 2017Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 29, 2016Citation Issued
Date: January 03, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition non return of maria cuellar non return of maria cuellar |
|
January 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Tickler Other CANCELED Tickler (1:30 PM) () Other disposition docs? case settled in November |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed Order of Dismissal/VIA EMAIL TO ATTYS CL-16-5027-H January 10, 2018 11:29 AM From: Ester C Espinoza "Ester C Espinoza" ; To: gracie "gracie" ; rgarcia@zreynalaw.com rgarcia@zreynalaw.com; rlyde "rlyde" ; vlopez@vlrhlaw.com Order of Dismissal/VIA EMAIL TO ATTYS CL-16-5027-H January 10, 2018 11:29 AM From: Ester C Espinoza "Ester C Espinoza" ; To: gracie "gracie" ; rgarcia@zreynalaw.com rgarcia@zreynalaw.com; rlyde "rlyde" ; vlopez@vlrhlaw |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Judge's Queue Order of Dismissal Order of Dismissal |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed NOTICE OF DELIVERY NOTICE OF DELIVERY |
|
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS |
|
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed NOTICE OF DELIVERY NOTICE OF DELIVERY |
|
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Trial on Merits Other CANCELED Trial on Merits (1:30 PM) () Other |
|
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Maldonado, Omar) case settled** case settled** |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.