Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Martinez, Diana, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Sergio J. Sanchez, against Wal-Mart Stores Texas, L.L.C., represented by Jaime A. Drabek, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other (Oca) |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Order, Signed
Date: December 20, 2017Motion
Date: December 13, 2017Order Signed
Date: October 02, 2017Order Filed
Date: September 26, 2017Order Filed
Date: September 22, 2017Answer
Date: September 22, 2017Response
Date: September 18, 2017Order Filed
Date: August 07, 2017Motion
Date: August 07, 2017Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: May 25, 2017Motion
Date: May 01, 2017Rule 11 Agreement
Date: February 03, 2017Request
Date: January 20, 2017Order Filed
Date: January 20, 2017Answer
Date: January 20, 2017Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Trial on Merits Other CANCELED Trial on Merits (1:30 PM) () Other |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing Other CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (1:30 PM) () Other |
|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed Agreed Order of Dismissal/VIA EMAIL TO ATTYS CL-16-5014-H January 3, 2018 9:21 AM From: Ester C Espinoza "Ester C Espinoza" ; To: juan@sergiosanchezlaw.com juan@sergiosanchezlaw.com; jdrabek "jdra Agreed Order of Dismissal/VIA EMAIL TO ATTYS CL-16-5014-H January 3, 2018 9:21 AM From: Ester C Espinoza "Ester C Espinoza" ; To: juan@sergiosanchezlaw.com juan@sergiosanchezlaw.com; jdrabek "jdra |
|
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Hearing Other CANCELED Status Conference Hearing (8:30 AM) () Other *Mandatory Status* PT 1/12 T 1/17 |
|
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Agreed Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice Agreed Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice |
|
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Judge's Queue AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Signed ORDER DENYING DEF'S MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT E-MAILED COPY TO ATTY'S JUAN RAMOS & JAIME A. DRABEK CL-16-5014-H ORDER SIGNED October 3, 2017 2:16 PM From: Jacquelyn Perez "Jacquelyn Perez" ; To: JUAN "JUAN" ; DENICE "DENICE" ; jdrabek "jdrabek" ; CL-16-5014-H.pdf (32.4 KB) ORDER DENYING DEF'S MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT E-MAILED COPY TO ATTY'S JUAN RAMOS & JAIME A. DRABEK CL-16-5014-H ORDER SIGNED October 3, 2017 2:16 PM From: Jacquelyn Perez "Jacquelyn Perez" ; To: JUAN "JUAN" ; DENICE "DENICE" ; jdrabek "jdrabek" ; CL-16-5014-H.pdf (32.4 KB) |
|
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Called Aty Juan Ramos present for Plaintiff; Aty Travis Miller present for Defendant; MSJ hearing; Decision before friday 9/29 Aty Juan Ramos present for Plaintiff; Aty Travis Miller present for Defendant; MSJ hearing; Decision before friday 9/29 |
|
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Filed ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT WAL-MART STORES TEXAS, L.L.C MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT WAL-MART STORES TEXAS, L.L.C MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Judge's Queue ORDER DENYING DEF'S MFSJ ORDER DENYING DEF'S MFSJ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.