Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Saucedo, Maria, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Surya Mangi, against Wellington Insurance Company, represented by Tom F. Nye, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Order Signed
Date: March 08, 2019Order Filed
Date: February 28, 2019Motion
Date: February 28, 2019Order Filed
Date: March 15, 2017Order Filed
Date: March 15, 2017Motion
Date: March 15, 2017Answer
Date: January 30, 2017Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Signed AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Order of Dismissal Order of Dismissal |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice |
|
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel (1:00 PM) () Mediation Mediation |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Passed by Agreement - Parties mediated case Passed by Agreement - Parties mediated case |
|
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing OSH-MOT. TO COMPEL MEDIATION/E-MAILED TO ATTY'S CL-16-5004-B OSH MOT. TO COMPEL MEDIATION March 16, 2017 3:46 PM From: Alma Navarro "Alma Navarro" ; To: jlamont@gnqlawyers.com jlamont@gnqlawyers.com; saurabh "saurabh" ; MST943C.pdf (135.7 KB) OSH-MOT. TO COMPEL MEDIATION/E-MAILED TO ATTY'S CL-16-5004-B OSH MOT. TO COMPEL MEDIATION March 16, 2017 3:46 PM From: Alma Navarro "Alma Navarro" ; To: jlamont@gnqlawyers.com jlamont@gnqlawyers.com; saurabh "saurabh" ; MST943C.pdf (135.7 KB) |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Order Setting Hearing-Mot. to Compel Order Setting Hearing-Mot. to Compel |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Mediation Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Mediation |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Mediation Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Mediation |
|
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Returned - Served WELLINGTON INS. CO SERVED ON 1-3-17 WELLINGTON INS. CO SERVED ON 1-3-17 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.