Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mendoza, Liliana, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Surya Mangi, against Wellington, represented by Tom F. Nye, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Agreed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, Signed
Date: September 18, 2017Motion
Date: September 18, 2017Order Filed
Date: September 18, 2017Order Filed
Date: March 15, 2017Order Filed
Date: March 15, 2017Motion
Date: March 15, 2017Answer
Date: January 30, 2017Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Agreed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, Signed | |
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dimiss Motion Motion to Dimiss |
|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Order of Dimissal Order of Dimissal |
|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel (9:00 AM) () pl's- mtn to compel mediation Result: No Action Taken by Court pl's- mtn to compel mediation |
|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Called court reporter- tina fasci; atty surya mangi present for hrg; advised court parties mediated- did not settle; hrg passed court reporter- tina fasci; atty surya mangi present for hrg; advised court parties mediated- did not settle; hrg passed |
|
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed pl's mtn to compel mediation set for hrg on 4/5/17 @ 9am pl's mtn to compel mediation set for hrg on 4/5/17 @ 9am |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Order granting Plainitff's Motiong to Compel Mediation Order granting Plainitff's Motiong to Compel Mediation |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Order Setting Hearing Order Setting Hearing |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Mediation Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Mediation |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Returned - Served WELLINGTON (SERVED 1/6/17) WELLINGTON (SERVED 1/6/17) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.