Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Purcell, Johnny Mack, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Javier Pena, against Gridiron Burgers Llc, represented by Rebecca Vela, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract (Oca) |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 31, 2014Answer
Date: April 16, 2015DWOP Order, Signed
Date: August 31, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event | DWOP Order, Signed | |
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution, Signed Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution, Signed |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissal Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) () | |
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Dismissal for Want of Prosecution set to August 31, 2017 @ 9:00 a.m. Dismissal for Want of Prosecution set to August 31, 2017 @ 9:00 a.m. |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed Notice of Change of Address Notice of Change of Address |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer General Denial General Denial |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued CIT ON GRIDIRON BURGERS LLC Citation Issued CIT ON GRIDIRON BURGERS LLC |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Petition Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.