Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Gutierrez, Cynthia, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Armando J. Marroquin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract (Oca) |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: January 14, 2022Order Filed
Date: December 02, 2021Order Filed
Date: July 07, 2021Order of Transfer, Signed
Date: December 18, 2020Order Filed
Date: April 13, 2016Motion
Date: April 13, 2016Service Returned - Served
Date: August 13, 2015Citation Issued
Date: December 30, 2014Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 30, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Marroquin, Armando) | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed ON MTN FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT ON MTN FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Filed OSH ON DJ OSH ON DJ |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue OSH OSH |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Filed OSH Motion for Default Judgment OSH Motion for Default Judgment |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue OSH ON MOT FOR DJ OSH ON MOT FOR DJ |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Transfer, Signed | |
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Order Granting Default Judgment Order Granting Default Judgment |
|
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment |
|
August 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service Returned - Served CYNTHIA GUTIERREZ SERVED ON 8-12-15 CYNTHIA GUTIERREZ SERVED ON 8-12-15 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.