Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Espinosa, Carla, Espinosa, Eloy, Espinoza, Rosalinda Vargas, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Selvino Padilla, Jr., against Leal, Maria S., represented by Victor Vicinaiz, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other (Oca) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Order Signed
Date: June 26, 2015Order Filed
Date: June 22, 2015Motion
Date: June 22, 2015Order, Signed
Date: January 27, 2015Order, Signed
Date: December 29, 2014Motion
Date: December 29, 2014Answer
Date: December 29, 2014Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 29, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Received Ten Percent from Bank REC#2015-024118 CARLA ESPINOSA-MINOR GREATER STATE BANK CHECK#11313 CD#3500002125 REC#2015-024118 CARLA ESPINOSA-MINOR GREATER STATE BANK CHECK#11313 CD#3500002125 |
|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Entry MINOR HAS TURNED 18YRS -CARLA ESPINOSA CLOSING OF CD MINOR HAS TURNED 18YRS -CARLA ESPINOSA CLOSING OF CD |
|
June 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Signed ORDER GRANTING RELEASE OF FUNDS ORDER GRANTING RELEASE OF FUNDS |
|
June 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Order Granting Release of Funds signed. Order Granting Release of Funds signed. |
|
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Other Birth Certificate Birth Certificate |
|
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Order Granting Release of Funds Order Granting Release of Funds |
|
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Release of Funds Plaintiff's Motion for Release of Funds |
|
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Other GREATER STATE BANK-IBA $4,582.51 CARLA ESPINOZA, MINOR. GREATER STATE BANK-IBA $4,582.51 CARLA ESPINOZA, MINOR. |
|
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Trust Deposit 42/30 CK#638028 $4,582.51 REC#2015-004566 CARLA ESPINOSA, MINOR 42/30 CK#638028 $4,582.51 REC#2015-004566 CARLA ESPINOSA, MINOR |
|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed Final Judgment(order email to all atty ) Final Judgment(order email to all atty ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.