Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Patag, Jr., Rafael, Patag, Normita H., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Kelly K Mckinnis, against Green Tree Servicing, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Singleterry, Luis M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryReal Property - Other Real Property (Oca) |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
DWOP Order, Signed
Date: January 13, 2016Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 31, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Court Costs Paid AS PER COURT ORDER PLAINTIFF PAID CC AS PER COURT ORDER PLAINTIFF PAID CC Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
DWOP Order, Signed
Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case called by the Honorable Luis M. Singleterry. No one appeared. Names called 3 times; no response. Order Granting DWOP Granted and Signed. Case Called Case called by the Honorable Luis M. Singleterry. No one appeared. Names called 3 times; no response. Order Granting DWOP Granted and Signed. Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) () Result: Dismissed
Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue DWOP ORDER DWOP ORDER Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
DWOP Notice Sent TO: MCKINNIS22@YAHOO.COM TO: MCKINNIS22@YAHOO Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
DWOP Hearing SET FOR 1/13/16 AT 9AM SET FOR 1/13/16 AT 9AM Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue DWOP NOTICE DWOP NOTICE Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service Issued to Green Tree Servicing, LLC Service Issued to Green Tree Servicing, LLC Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.