Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Diaz, Adriana, Diaz, Jaime Daniel, filed a(n) Mdl-13-0123 case represented by John Steven Mostyn, against Germania Farm, Lopez, Jose A., Munoz, Luis C., The Littleton Group, represented by John Steven Mostyn, Victor Vicinaiz, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Reyna, Rose G. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryMdl-13-0123 |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Order Of Dismissal |
Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, Signed
Date: January 08, 2016Request
Date: January 06, 2016Order Filed
Date: June 29, 2015Response
Date: June 26, 2015Order Filed
Date: June 18, 2015Motion
Date: June 18, 2015Request
Date: June 18, 2015Order Filed
Date: February 23, 2015Order Filed
Date: February 19, 2015Answer
Date: February 09, 2015Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 30, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Court Costs Paid PARTY INCURRED PARTY INCURRED Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Show Cause Hearing (JP-OCA) Case Disposed CANCELED Show Cause Hearing (JP-OCA) (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Case Disposed ATTYS TO SUBMIT DISP. DOCUMENTS Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Tickler (5:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) CLERK TO DISPOSE CASE CLERK TO DISPOSE CASE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, Signed Agreed Order of Dismissal Agreed Order of Dismissal Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue Agreed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice Agreed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent OSH-SHOW CAUSE, CC: TO ALL PARTIES OSH-SHOW CAUSE, CC: TO ALL PARTIES Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed OSH-SHOW CAUSE OSH-SHOW CAUSE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request Agreed Motion to Dismiss Agreed Motion to Dismiss Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Tickler (5:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) CASE SETTLED; ATTY TO SUBMIT DISPOSE DOCUMENTS CASE SETTLED; ATTY TO SUBMIT DISPOSE DOCUMENTS Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.