Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ponce, Angelica, Ponce, Huberto, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rene M. Sigman, against Barkkume, Richard, Ngm Insurance Company, Pineau, Kimberly, Wellington Claim Service, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Comment (ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Suit |
Order Signed
Date: January 04, 2016Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 30, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Court Costs Paid
Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Comment (ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Tickler (5:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) CLERKS TO DISPOSE CASE CLERKS TO DISPOSE CASE Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Comment (ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Comment (ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE |
|
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Signed ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Comment (ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE |
|
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit, Filed PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Comment (ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE |
|
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Comment (ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service Returned KIMBERLY PINEAU SERVED 2/7/15 KIMBERLY PINEAU SERVED 2/7/15 Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Comment (ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE |
|
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service Returned RICHARD BARKKUME SERVED ON 1/22/15 RICHARD BARKKUME SERVED ON 1/22/15 Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Comment (ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE |
|
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service Returned NMG INSURANCE COMPANY 1/21/15 NMG INSURANCE COMPANY 1/21/15 Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Comment (ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE |
|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service Returned WELLINGTON CLAIM SERVICE, INC. SERVED ON 1/21/15 WELLINGTON CLAIM SERVICE, INC. SERVED ON 1/21/15 Judge: Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) Comment (ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.