Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lone Star National Bank, filed a(n) All Other Civil Cases (Oca) case represented by Weldon G. Nixon, against Ogba, Mary V., in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Cuellar, Marla presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryAll Other Civil Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeSummary Judgment |
Proposed Order
Date: November 09, 2016Motion for Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: November 09, 2016Order on Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel, Signed
Date: October 19, 2016Order Filed
Date: October 04, 2016Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record, Filed
Date: October 04, 2016Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: June 22, 2015Defendant's Original Answer
Date: April 16, 2015Order Filed
Date: March 18, 2015Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 30, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Returned Undeliverable MARY OGBA - SUMMARY JUDGMENT MARY OGBA - SUMMARY JUDGMENT Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment SIGNED SIGNED Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion For Summary Judgment Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Partida, Juan) 1:00 PM SUMMARY JUDGMENT 1:00 PM SUMMARY JUDGMENT Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Called BEFORE JUDGE FRED HINOJOSA - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WAS GRANTED & ORDER SIGNED, COURT REPORTER DOLLY. BEFORE JUDGE FRED HINOJOSA - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WAS GRANTED & ORDER SIGNED, COURT REPORTER DOLLY. Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Returned Undeliverable MARY OGBA - ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MARY OGBA - ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Quash
Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court MARY V. OGBA'S MOTION TO QUASH MARY V. OGBA'S MOTION TO QUASH Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ORDER ON MARY V. OGBA'S MOTION TO QUASH ORDER ON MARY V. OGBA'S MOTION TO QUASH Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue
Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.