Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Villarreal, Rene, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Eddy Trevino, against The State Of Texas, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Cuellar, Marla presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
DWOP Order, Signed
Date: September 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Cost Waived HABEAS CORPUS HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
DWOP Order, Signed
Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Called HELD. COURT TOOK JUDICIAL NOTICE OF ALL DOCUMENTS IN THE COURT'S FILE INCLUDING NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. NO PARTIES PRESENT. CASE DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION. COURT REPORTER: TERESA NAVARRO. /PG/ HELD. COURT TOOK JUDICIAL NOTICE OF ALL DOCUMENTS IN THE COURT'S FILE INCLUDING NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. NO PARTIES PRESENT. CASE DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION. COURT REPORTER: TERESA NAVARRO. /PG/ Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Want of Prosecution (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Cuellar, Marla)
Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
DWOP Notice Sent
Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Signed ORDER OF TRANSFER, SIGNED/ESC TRANSFERRED TO 275TH ORDER OF TRANSFER, SIGNED/ESC TRANSFERRED TO 275TH Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Called MICHELLE PUIG, EDDY TREVINO AND DEFT APPRD; DEFT HAS PENDING CASE IN 275TH; CASE TO BE TRANSFERRED TO 275TH/ESC MICHELLE PUIG, EDDY TREVINO AND DEFT APPRD; DEFT HAS PENDING CASE IN 275TH; CASE TO BE TRANSFERRED TO 275TH/ESC Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Salinas Flores, Aida) **jail** PID 423768 Result: Held **jail** PID 423768 Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice EDDY TREVINO EDDY TREVINO Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.