Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Barrera, Sergio, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Mario Ramirez, against The State Of Texas, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Aida Salinas Flores presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2014 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Order, Signed
Date: January 02, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed for Mario Ramirez $275 by Judge ASF.MF for Mario Ramirez $275 by Judge ASF.MF |
|
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed for Mario Ramirez $490 by Judge ASF.MF for Mario Ramirez $490 by Judge ASF.MF |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Denying, Signed | |
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Called MICHELLE PUIG, MARIO RAMIREZ AND DEFT APPRD; BOND REDUCTION DENIED; ORDER SIGNED/ESC MICHELLE PUIG, MARIO RAMIREZ AND DEFT APPRD; BOND REDUCTION DENIED; ORDER SIGNED/ESC |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Salinas Flores, Aida) **Jail** PID 1072855 01/06/2015 Reset by Court to 01/08/2015 Result: Denied **Jail** PID 1072855 |
|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Called in Aux A, Judge Jaime Garza - hrg reset for 1-8-15 @ 8:30 am/esc in Aux A, Judge Jaime Garza - hrg reset for 1-8-15 @ 8:30 am/esc |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice MARIO RAMIREZ, IC MARIO RAMIREZ, IC |
|
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed ORDER SETTING PROBABLE CAUSE HEARING ORDER SETTING PROBABLE CAUSE HEARING |
|
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER SETTING PROBALE CAUSE HEARING, IC ORDER SETTING PROBALE CAUSE HEARING, IC |
|
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed WHC set for 1-6-15 @ 8:30 am/esc WHC set for 1-6-15 @ 8:30 am/esc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.