Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Avendano, Maria Del Carmen, filed a(n) Declaratory Judgment case represented by Pamela M. Brown, Roberto Jackson, Jr., against Morales, Rosa Hernandez, represented by John Andrew Rigney, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts 430th District Court with Ramon, Israel, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 28, 2011 |
CategoryDeclaratory Judgment |
Last RefreshedMay 08, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
|
Filing Court House430th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeCase Consolidated Into Prior Case |
Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: August 16, 2013Notice Sent
Date: April 26, 2024Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed
Date: April 30, 2024Citation Returned
Date: March 29, 2011Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 25, 2024Motion
Date: September 06, 2011Order Setting Hearing
Date: April 16, 2024Order Re-Setting Hearing
Date: April 30, 2024Affidavit
Date: March 28, 2011Order Setting Hearing
Date: April 05, 2024Rule 11 Agreement Reviewed and Returned by Court
Date: April 24, 2024Motion to Enforce
Date: April 04, 2024Motion
Date: May 03, 2024Order Withdrawing as Counsel, Signed
Date: September 29, 2011Court Cost Waived
Date: June 11, 2013Notice Sent
Date: May 03, 2024Answer
Date: April 18, 2011Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 08, 2024Audit Letter
Date: May 27, 2011Notice Sent
Date: April 15, 2024Plaintiff's Original Petition (OCA)
Date: March 28, 2011Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: April 24, 2024Notice
Date: November 08, 2011Order Setting Hearing
Date: September 08, 2011Order Setting Hearing
Date: April 30, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Called C/R Yvette Araiza; Reset under F-1351-10-J to 6.27.24 @ 1:30 pm. C/R Yvette Araiza; Reset under F-1351-10-J to 6.27.24 @ 1:30 pm. Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enforce (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramon, Israel, Jr.) FILED UNDER WRONG CASE. CONSOLIDATED INTO F-1351-10-J . FILED UNDER WRONG CASE. CONSOLIDATED INTO F-1351-10-J . Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion TO SHOW AUTHORITY TO SHOW AUTHORITY Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER RE-SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT ROSA MORALES??? MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION ORDER RE-SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT ROSA MORALES??? MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed ON DEFENDANT ROSA MORALES' MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION ON DEFENDANT ROSA MORALES' MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Re-Setting Hearing ON DEFENDANT ROSA MORALES' MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION ON DEFENDANT ROSA MORALES' MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enforce (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramon, Israel, Jr.) FILED UNDER WRONG CASE. CONSOLIDATED INTO F-1351-10-J . 04/25/2024 Reset by Court to 04/30/2024 FILED UNDER WRONG CASE. CONSOLIDATED INTO F-1351-10-J . Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER RE-SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT ROSA MORALES' MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION ORDER RE-SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT ROSA MORALES' MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Called C/R Yvette Araiza; Reset to 5.6.24 @ 10:00 am. C/R Yvette Araiza; Reset to 5.6.24 @ 10:00 am. Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.