Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Banik, Bimal K, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Roy S. Dale, against Begum Ahmad, Hassan, represented by M. Mario Garcia, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Reyna, Rose G. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 15, 2013 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other (Oca) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Order Signed
Date: May 12, 2015Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: April 14, 2015Order Filed
Date: December 19, 2014Motion
Date: December 19, 2014Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: December 12, 2014Order Signed
Date: October 27, 2014Order Signed
Date: October 22, 2014Request
Date: September 16, 2014Order, Signed
Date: August 27, 2014Order, Signed
Date: August 27, 2014Motion to Quash
Date: July 30, 2014Motion to Quash
Date: July 29, 2014Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: April 11, 2014Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: March 13, 2014Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: March 11, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Bill of Cost $1,698.00 DUE FROM DEFENDANT AS PER COURT ORDER FROM 5/2/15 (TO RECOVER CC) SO PLAINTIFF CAN BE REFUNDED; CCP BY PLAINTIFF $1,698.00 DUE FROM DEFENDANT AS PER COURT ORDER FROM 5/2/15 (TO RECOVER CC) SO PLAINTIFF CAN BE REFUNDED; CCP BY PLAINTIFF Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment, Signed SENT TO DC QUE ON 5/13/15 SENT TO DC QUE ON 5/13/15 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue AGREED JUDGMENT AGREED JUDGMENT Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
May 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Signed Agreed Judgment Agreed Judgment Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent OSH-SHOW CAUSE, CC: TO ALL PARTIES OSH-SHOW CAUSE, CC: TO ALL PARTIES Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed OSH-Show Cause OSH-Show Cause Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed setting case for a Show Cause Hrg. on 5.21.2015 at 8:00 a.m.; Order forward to clerk. setting case for a Show Cause Hrg. on 5.21.2015 at 8:00 a.m.; Order forward to clerk. Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Order setting shoe cause e-filed; envelope # 5057160 Order setting shoe cause e-filed; envelope # 5057160 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Tickler (5:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) D/L to Submit Disp. Documents 04/14/2015 Reset by Court to 04/28/2015 D/L to Submit Disp. Documents Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.