Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Ochoa Resendez, Anna Virginia, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Singleterry, Luis M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryForeclosures |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Court Costs Paid
Date: July 26, 2017Order Signed
Date: May 08, 2017Notice Sent
Date: February 22, 2017Non-Military Affidavit
Date: February 22, 2017Proposed Order
Date: February 21, 2017Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: February 21, 2017Order Setting Hearing
Date: February 21, 2017Non-Military Affidavit
Date: February 21, 2017Motion
Date: February 21, 2017Affidavit
Date: February 21, 2017Affidavit
Date: February 21, 2017Citation Issued
Date: December 29, 2016Application for Foreclosure (OCA)
Date: December 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court Costs Paid
Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Ochoa Resendez, Anna Virginia Served 05/31/2017 Returned 06/02/2017 Occupant Served 05/31/2017 Returned 06/02/2017
Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Signed GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR FORECLOSURE GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR FORECLOSURE Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR FORECLOSURE ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR FORECLOSURE Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Called Attorneys Justino "JR" Garza and Mark Talbot present for hearing. Default Judgment Granted. Order on file and to be signed by Judge Singeterry. Attorneys Justino "JR" Garza and Mark Talbot present for hearing. Default Judgment Granted. Order on file and to be signed by Judge Singeterry. Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application for Foreclosure (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Singleterry, Luis M.) 04/04/2017 Reset by Court to 04/05/2017 04/05/2017 Reset by Court to 04/10/2017 Result: Granted
Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ORDER SETTING HEARING Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit OF TOM L. NEWTON JR. OF TOM L. NEWTON JR. Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order GRANTING APPLICATION OF FORECLOSURE GRANTING APPLICATION OF FORECLOSURE Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.