Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Buitron, Jose Angel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hector L. Rodriguez, against Munoz, Natalie Kaye, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, represented by Scott A. Seelhoff, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Noe Gonzalez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNoe Gonzalez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 22, 2020Notice Sent
Date: April 22, 2020Order Setting Hearing
Date: April 15, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: April 15, 2020Notice Sent
Date: March 23, 2020Amended Petition
Date: March 23, 2020Notice
Date: March 23, 2020Order Setting Hearing
Date: February 18, 2020Notice Sent
Date: February 18, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: February 18, 2020Motion to Sever, Filed
Date: February 18, 2020Citation Issued
Date: January 22, 2020Defendant's Original Answer
Date: February 18, 2020Amended Petition
Date: January 21, 2020Citation Issued
Date: December 27, 2019Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Entries COURT STAFF RECEIVED A CALL FROM COUNSEL FOR CASE INDICATING CASE SETTLED, AND HEARING ON 5-29-20 NOT NECESSARY; LMK COURT STAFF RECEIVED A CALL FROM COUNSEL FOR CASE INDICATING CASE SETTLED, AND HEARING ON 5-29-20 NOT NECESSARY; LMK |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Attorney Agreement CANCELED Motion for Severance (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Noe) Attorney Agreement and Abate DEF'S MTN TO COMPEL DISCOVERY TO BE HEARD VIA ZOOM |
|
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEVER AND ABATE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEVER AND ABATE |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Entries ZOOM NOTICE SENT ON 5-21-20 CONTAINED WRONG MEETING ID, AMENDED NOTICE E-MAILED TO COUNSEL; LMK ZOOM NOTICE SENT ON 5-21-20 CONTAINED WRONG MEETING ID, AMENDED NOTICE E-MAILED TO COUNSEL; LMK |
|
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Entries ZOOM INFO E-MAILED TO COUNSEL FOR 5-29-20 HEARING; LMK ZOOM INFO E-MAILED TO COUNSEL FOR 5-29-20 HEARING; LMK |
|
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Entries OSH ON DEF'S MTN TO COMPEL DISCOVERY=SGN; SET FOR 5-29-20 @ 8:00 A. OSH ON DEF'S MTN TO COMPEL DISCOVERY=SGN; SET FOR 5-29-20 @ 8:00 A. Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
|
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY Judge: Gonzalez, Noe |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.