Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Magdalena Garza Hinojosa, against Perez, Rafael Enrique Diaz, represented by Melisandra Mendoza, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryFugitive Warrant |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Order of Commitment, Signed
Date: January 07, 2020Fugitive Warrant (OCA)
Date: December 26, 2019Order of Commitment Returned by Sheriff
Date: January 08, 2020Order Appointing Attorney, Signed
Date: January 07, 2020Order Signed
Date: January 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (9:00 AM) () 90-day fugitive complaint 90-day fugitive complaint |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing Reset CANCELED Status Hearing (9:00 AM) () Reset 60 DAY STATUS |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Receipt | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Commitment Returned by Sheriff | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Commitment, Signed | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Attorney, Signed (Judicial Officer: Guerra, Fidencio, Jr. ) | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Signed FUGITIVE COMPLAINT FUGITIVE COMPLAINT |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Auxilliary Court A Hearing (Judicial Officer: Guerra, Fidencio, Jr. ) CASE CALLED; ATTY/DEFT PRESENT; BOND SET AT $1,000 C/S; DEFT TO BE BACK TO COURT ON 3/6/20 FOR 60 DAY STATUS CASE CALLED; ATTY/DEFT PRESENT; BOND SET AT $1,000 C/S; DEFT TO BE BACK TO COURT ON 3/6/20 FOR 60 DAY STATUS |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Initial Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Guerra, Fidencio, Jr.) SO 01496583 Result: Held SO 01496583 |
|
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Fugitive Warrant (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.