Case Last Refreshed: 22 hours ago
Engebretson, Lori, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Efrain Molina, Jr., against Aladdin Villas Property Owners Association, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts 398th District Court with Librado Keno Vasquez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Other Real Property (Oca) |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court House398th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Suit |
This legal document is a complaint filed by Lori Engebretson against Aladdin Villas Property Owners Association, Inc. The complaint alleges that the association violated the law by refusing to include the plaintiff on the January ballot for the assoc...
Citation Issued
Date: December 19, 2023Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Date: March 21, 2024Citation Issued
Date: December 19, 2023Proposed Order
Date: March 18, 2024Notice of Non-Suit, Signed
Date: March 21, 2024Notice Sent
Date: March 21, 2024Defendant's Original Answer
Date: January 19, 2024Notice
Date: March 18, 2024Court Costs Paid
Date: March 27, 2024Notice
Date: December 14, 2023Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 14, 2023Service Issued
Date: December 19, 2023Notice
Date: December 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Costs Paid
Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit, Signed WITH PREJUDICE WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ON NOTICE FOR NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE ON NOTICE FOR NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice OF AND MOTION OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE OF AND MOTION OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue
Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer
Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued REISSUED Citation Issued REISSUED Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation Issued Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno" |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.