Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Garza, Ramon, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Michael E. Flanagan, against Geico County Mutual Insurance Company, Settle-Sanchez, Ashley Krystal, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by Guillermo Tijerina, Jr., Ralph M. Rodriguez, Rogelio Garcia, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Vasquez, L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2018 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedNovember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Suit |
Notice
Date: July 10, 2020Proposed Order
Date: August 09, 2019Amended Answer
Date: February 04, 2019Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: February 01, 2019Notice of Lead Counsel, Filed
Date: November 19, 2021Notice Sent
Date: September 01, 2020Notice of Delivery
Date: June 18, 2019Amended
Date: September 13, 2019Amended
Date: September 13, 2019Proposed Order
Date: January 31, 2022Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: August 07, 2020Notice
Date: December 09, 2019Proposed Order
Date: October 22, 2020Notice Sent
Date: February 04, 2020Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 26, 2018Defendant's Original Answer
Date: February 01, 2019Proposed Order
Date: February 28, 2020Notice Sent
Date: October 08, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: November 01, 2019Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: August 28, 2020Citation Issued
Date: January 04, 2019Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: December 02, 2019Proposed Order
Date: August 28, 2020Designation
Date: August 09, 2019Notice Sent
Date: October 27, 2020Proposed Order
Date: October 28, 2019Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: January 27, 2020Notice
Date: December 09, 2019Proposed Order
Date: October 28, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: October 28, 2019Deposition
Date: October 11, 2019Notice Sent
Date: July 20, 2021Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: January 31, 2020Notice Sent
Date: November 01, 2019Jury Demand
Date: January 17, 2019Proposed Order
Date: October 11, 2019Proposed Order
Date: August 05, 2021Notice
Date: December 09, 2019Notice of Non-Suit, Filed
Date: January 31, 2022Notice Sent
Date: January 31, 2020Notice Sent
Date: October 31, 2019Agreed Scheduling Order, Signed
Date: October 26, 2020Agreed Scheduling Order, Signed
Date: March 03, 2020Order Setting Hearing
Date: January 27, 2020Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: October 08, 2020Defendant's Original Answer
Date: February 04, 2019Proposed Order
Date: September 24, 2020Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: March 16, 2020Notice of Intent to Take Written Deposition
Date: September 04, 2019Notice
Date: August 29, 2019Designation of Attorney
Date: March 21, 2019Order Setting Hearing
Date: January 31, 2020Rule 11 Agreement Reviewed and Returned by Court
Date: December 02, 2019Proposed Order
Date: July 19, 2021Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed
Date: October 11, 2019Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: February 03, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: July 20, 2021Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: September 01, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: October 31, 2019Notice
Date: December 09, 2019Agreed Scheduling Order, Signed
Date: August 05, 2021Designation
Date: July 02, 2019Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: January 08, 2020Other
Date: January 17, 2023Rule 11 Agreement Reviewed and Returned by Court
Date: January 17, 2023Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: January 17, 2023Charge of the Court
Date: January 17, 2023Proposed Order
Date: January 17, 2023Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: January 17, 2023Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: January 17, 2023Charge of the Court
Date: January 13, 2023Proposed Order
Date: January 13, 2023Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: January 13, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: January 13, 2023Proposed Order
Date: January 13, 2023Amended Answer
Date: January 10, 2023Affidavit
Date: January 13, 2023Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: January 13, 2023Notice
Date: August 09, 2022Notice Sent
Date: June 14, 2022Agreed Scheduling Order, Signed
Date: June 14, 2022Notice Sent
Date: May 06, 2022Proposed Order
Date: June 13, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: May 06, 2022Notice Sent
Date: May 06, 2022Proposed Order
Date: May 05, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: May 06, 2022Proposed Order
Date: May 05, 2022Notice Sent
Date: April 27, 2022Motion to Quash
Date: May 05, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 26, 2022Motion to Quash
Date: May 05, 2022Motion to Sever, Filed
Date: April 06, 2022Proposed Order
Date: April 06, 2022Amended Answer
Date: April 14, 2022Proposed Order
Date: April 06, 2022Order for Partial Non-Suit, Signed
Date: January 31, 2022Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: February 05, 2019Notice Sent
Date: August 05, 2021Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: January 30, 2020Answer
Date: January 17, 2019Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: October 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Other CASE LAW FOR WILLIAM BELVINS V. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, NO. 02-17-00276-CV CASE LAW FOR WILLIAM BELVINS V. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, NO. 02-17-00276-CV Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno") Party(GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement Reviewed and Returned by Court
Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno") Party(GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance, Filed WITH EXHIBIT A WITH EXHIBIT A Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno") Party(GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Charge of the Court PROPOSED Charge of the Court PROPOSED Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno") Party(GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno") Party(GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno") Party(GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine, Filed
Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno") Party(GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue RULE 11 AGREEMENT RULE 11 AGREEMENT Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno") Party(GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial on Merits (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno")
Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno") Party(GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Charge of the Court DEFENDANT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY Charge of the Court DEFENDANT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno") Party(GEICO County Mutual Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.