Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Frayser, Mark, filed a(n) All Other Civil Cases (Oca) case represented by Katie P. Klein, against Texas Parks & Wildlife Department, represented by John Ramsey, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Israel Ramon, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 17, 2021 |
CategoryAll Other Civil Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedNovember 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Order Setting Hearing
Date: February 18, 2022Notice Sent
Date: May 04, 2022Affidavit
Date: September 22, 2023Notice Sent
Date: October 03, 2023Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed
Date: June 29, 2022Notice Sent
Date: May 25, 2022Brief
Date: May 10, 2022Amended Petition
Date: August 23, 2023Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Date: September 15, 2023Notice Sent
Date: April 20, 2022Objection
Date: August 01, 2022Amended Petition
Date: July 21, 2022Order Returned by Court
Date: October 27, 2023Notice Sent
Date: June 30, 2022Proposed Order
Date: October 23, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: September 11, 2023Order Re-Setting Hearing
Date: June 29, 2022Response
Date: August 10, 2022DWOP Order, Signed
Date: September 15, 2023Motion
Date: May 03, 2022Vacation Letter Filed by Attorneys
Date: May 24, 2022Motion for Reconsideration, Filed
Date: August 09, 2022Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: April 05, 2022Notice Sent
Date: September 26, 2023Plea to the Jurisdiction
Date: July 29, 2022Court Costs Paid
Date: September 21, 2023Notice Sent
Date: April 18, 2022Order to Transfer Venue, Signed
Date: October 23, 2023Proposed Order
Date: September 20, 2023Reply
Date: April 05, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: February 22, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 20, 2022Notice Sent
Date: October 10, 2023Motion
Date: July 28, 2022Special Exceptions
Date: April 13, 2022Citation Issued
Date: December 16, 2021Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: May 20, 2022Amended
Date: March 14, 2022Proposed Order
Date: April 13, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: April 19, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: May 03, 2022Proposed Order
Date: April 12, 2022Order Returned by Court
Date: June 20, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: April 14, 2022Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed
Date: April 14, 2022Motion to Quash
Date: April 18, 2022Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: May 18, 2022Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: March 14, 2022Order of Reinstatement, Signed (OCA)
Date: October 10, 2023Original Petition (OCA)
Date: November 17, 2021Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: May 03, 2022DWOP Notice Sent
Date: August 11, 2023Amended
Date: May 26, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: September 20, 2023Response
Date: May 09, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: September 11, 2023Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: September 22, 2023Notice of Intent to Take Oral-Video Deposition
Date: April 14, 2022Notice Sent
Date: October 24, 2023Proposed Order
Date: May 09, 2022Response
Date: May 03, 2022Amended Petition
Date: January 24, 2022Objection
Date: April 13, 2022Notice Sent
Date: April 18, 2022Amended Petition
Date: April 11, 2022Order Returned by Court
Date: August 09, 2022Proposed Order
Date: May 17, 2022Notice Sent
Date: February 24, 2022Amended Answer
Date: July 21, 2022Motion to Reinstate Case, Filed
Date: September 20, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: May 20, 2022Transfer of Venue, Filed
Date: January 24, 2022Motion
Date: April 12, 2022Order Signed
Date: October 10, 2023Amended Petition
Date: July 21, 2022Response
Date: May 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramon, Israel, Jr.) RULING RULING Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO TRAVIS COUNTY TEXAS ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO TRAVIS COUNTY TEXAS Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Transfer Venue, Signed TRANSFER TO TRAVIS COUNTY TX TRANSFER TO TRAVIS COUNTY TX Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF MARK FRAYSER'S VERRIFIED MOTION TO REINSTATE CASE ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF MARK FRAYSER'S VERRIFIED MOTION TO REINSTATE CASE Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Reinstatement, Signed (OCA)
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Plaintiff Mark Frayser's Verified Motion to Reinstate Case 2) Plaintiff Mark Frayser's Motion to Reconsider Plaintiff Mark Frayser's Verified Motion to Reinstate Case 2) Plaintiff Mark Frayser's Motion to Reconsider Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Signed GRANTING PLAINTIFF MARK FRAYSER'S VERIFIED MOTION TO REINSTATE CASE GRANTING PLAINTIFF MARK FRAYSER'S VERIFIED MOTION TO REINSTATE CASE Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.