Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, filed a(n) All Other Civil Cases (Oca) case represented by Gregory R. Ave, against Aranda, Edgar, Villanueva, Lenice, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Marla Cuellar presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2023 |
CategoryAll Other Civil Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
This complaint is a plaintiff's original petition for declaratory judgment filed by Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company against defendants Lenice Marcelina Villanueva and Edgar Aranda. Progressive seeks a declaration that it has no duty to de...
Order Returned by Court
Date: January 02, 2024Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: January 10, 2024Motion for Default Judgment
Date: December 05, 2023Request for Service
Date: October 31, 2023Non-Military Affidavit
Date: December 05, 2023Citation Issued
Date: October 31, 2023Original Petition (OCA)
Date: October 31, 2023Notice Sent
Date: January 11, 2024Certificate of Last Known Address of Defendant
Date: December 05, 2023Certificate of Last Known Address of Defendant
Date: December 05, 2023Order Returned by Court
Date: January 18, 2024Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Date: February 07, 2024Final Judgment, Signed
Date: February 07, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment, Signed
Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Cuellar, Marla)
Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court FINAL JUDGMENT FINAL JUDGMENT Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ORDER SETTING HEARING Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed OSH ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OSH ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER SETTING HEARING ORDER SETTING HEARING Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ORDER SETTING HEARING Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.