Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Lilly Ann Gutierrez, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Jaime E. Tijerina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJaime E. Tijerina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 07, 2019 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Order Signed
Date: October 10, 2019Proposed Order
Date: October 07, 2019Proposed Order
Date: October 07, 2019Proposed Order
Date: October 07, 2019Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: October 07, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, SIGNED ORDER ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, SIGNED |
|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Signed ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS |
|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Atty M. Lopez and A. Barrera present for State. Atty Lilly Gutierrez present for Def. Def. present, in custody. Court denied writ. -ag Atty M. Lopez and A. Barrera present for State. Atty Lilly Gutierrez present for Def. Def. present, in custody. Court denied writ. -ag |
|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Entries ORDER ON WRIT, SIGNED (ENV #37522042) -AG ORDER ON WRIT, SIGNED (ENV #37522042) -AG |
|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Habeas Corpus (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Tijerina, Jaime) Result: Held | |
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Judge's Queue ORDER ON WRIT (ENV #37522042) -AG ORDER ON WRIT (ENV #37522042) -AG |
|
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue | |
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING, SIGNED ORDER SETTING HEARING, SIGNED |
|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing, Signed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.